U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10448-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BLACKWELL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 15, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.