U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10402-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MERCEDES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.