U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10558-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ABUAWAD, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.