U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10437-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VALERIO, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Appear]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.