U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-05036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRIMFIELD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.