U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13456-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CREMOSNIK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 21, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.