U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13464-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PICHARDO-PERALTA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • December 21, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.