U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-05037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FLOWERS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.