U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10433-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GIRAUD III
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2021: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.