U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13427-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JACQUELYN PENA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.