U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-12313-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Bond]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.