U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-12325-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TIMMONS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Petition and Order for Summons VOSR]
  • August 24, 2022: [Bond]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 26, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.