U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13417-2
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 15, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.