U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15499-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DAIUTOLO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.