U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13439-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DIAZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.