U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15496-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DEJESUS MENDEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.