U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15499-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 04, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order]
  • December 30, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.