U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13448-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEON CLARK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea Application of Guilty]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 14, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.