U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15519-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GOODGAME
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.