U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08359-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TSC AGENCY, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Submission Notice re Sentencing Materials]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Certification]
  • January 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 05, 2022: [Plea Application of Guilty]
  • January 05, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.