U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BURWELL et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 18, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.