U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHARIF
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Letter Request to Issue Writ of Execution]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.