U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-04000-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PIERCE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • June 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.