U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLLADO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Dismissal]
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order]
  • March 19, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 13, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 26, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 06, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.