U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13443-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CASEY ROONEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.