U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RUSH et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [CJA 30 - Appointment]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [CJA 30 - Appointment]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 28, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 26, 2022: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.