U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RODRIGUEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2023: [Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 25, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.