U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08000-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DIAZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.