U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-06009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POPE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 21, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.