U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-17001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PARRISH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.