U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AGUDELO GUERRERO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 08, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.