U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLEMAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.