U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-06014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CRANN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Bond]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Docket Annotation (public)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 06, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • February 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.