U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-06006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARIO RENTERIA, JR.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.