U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-17002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAWSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.