U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RODRIGUEZ SATURRIA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 26, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Complaint]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.