U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-05519-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERRIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 23, 2022: [Bond]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.