U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13415-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LANDEROS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.