U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WESTOVER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 27, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.