U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAMILO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2022: [Complaint]
  • January 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.