U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAMUS BEN-SHIMON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 01, 2022: [Affidavit ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extradition Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Extradition Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.