U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VALDEZ et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Bond]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.