U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-15014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LUTENCO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [Bond]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.