U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-16273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAWKINS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 21, 2022: [Return of Property/PreTrial]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 11, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 11, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • February 08, 2022: [Bond]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.