U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-13029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. REYES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 11, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.