U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-06000-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHN DEFAY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.