U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-15015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. QUINONES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 29, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.