U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAYLOR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.