U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-17017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PAYERO-DOMINGUEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Complaint]
  • March 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.