U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COOK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.